WA SB6091 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-31 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-31 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Continuing the work of the Washington food policy forum.
Title
Continuing the work of the Washington food policy forum.
Sponsors
Sen. Judith Warnick [R] | Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] | Sen. Liz Lovelett [D] | Sen. Derek Stanford [D] |
Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-06 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-31 | Senate | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-03-31 | Senate | Chapter 246, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-31 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-06 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-06 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-04 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-03-03 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-03-02 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2020-03-02 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-29 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2020-02-28 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2020-02-28 | House | RDAN - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-26 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-14 | House | First reading, referred to Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | AWNP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks. |
2019-12-18 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |