WA SB6088 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-03 - Governor vetoed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing a prescription drug affordability board.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a prescription drug affordability board.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 31 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-03SenateGovernor vetoed.
2020-03-12SenateDelivered to Governor.
2020-03-11HouseSpeaker signed.
2020-03-11SenatePresident signed.
2020-03-09SenatePassed final passage; yeas, 31; nays, 17; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2020-03-09SenateSenate concurred in House amendments.
2020-03-06HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2020-03-06HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-03-06HouseCommittee amendment
2020-03-04HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2020-03-03HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2020-03-02HouseMinority; do not pass.
2020-03-02HouseAPP - Majority; do pass with amendment
2020-03-02HousePublic hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2020-02-28HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2020-02-27HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2020-02-27HouseMinority; do not pass.
2020-02-27HouseHCW - Majority; do pass.
2020-02-27HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM.
2020-02-26HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM.
2020-02-19HouseFirst reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness.
2020-02-17SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 28; nays, 20; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2020-02-17SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-02-17Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2020-02-13SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2020-02-11SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2020-02-11SenateMinority; do not pass.
2020-02-11SenateWM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2020-02-11SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM.
2020-02-06SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2020-01-30SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2020-01-29SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2020-01-29SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2020-01-29SenateHLTC - Majority; do pass.
2020-01-29SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM.
2020-01-17SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM.
2020-01-13SenateFirst reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care.
2019-12-18SenatePrefiled for introduction.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=6088&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6088.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6088-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Passed Legislature/6088-S.PL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=120735&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=02-17-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=6088&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=120735&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-06-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=6088&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=120735&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-09-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=6088&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback