WA SB6088 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Making K-12 education enhancements.
Title
Making K-12 education enhancements.
Sponsors
Sen. John Braun [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-06 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2016-01-11 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-07-10 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Placed on third reading. |
2015-06-28 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-24 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2015-04-08 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 27; nays, 22; absent, 27; excused, 22. |
2015-04-03 | Senate | Held on calendar. |
2015-04-03 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:00 PM. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |