WA SB6081 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the calculation of compensation of an employee of a medical school and an affiliated faculty group practice for purposes of a noncompetition agreement.
Title
Concerning the calculation of compensation of an employee of a medical school and an affiliated faculty group practice for purposes of a noncompetition agreement.
Sponsors
Sen. Marko Liias [D] | Sen. Curtis King [R] | Sen. Derek Stanford [D] | Sen. Randi Becker [R] |
Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. John Braun [R] | Sen. Lisa Wellman [D] | Sen. Steven Conway [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Returned to Senate Rules 3. |
2020-02-25 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-19 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | LBRC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:30 AM. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
2019-12-16 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |