WA SB6081 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creating a grant program to develop and modernize specialized STEM facilities.
Title
Creating a grant program to develop and modernize specialized STEM facilities.
Sponsors
Sen. Bruce Dammeier [R] | Sen. Mark Mullet [D] | Sen. Jim Honeyford [R] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] |
Sen. Jeanne Kohl-Welles [D] | Sen. Steven Conway [D] | Sen. Rosemary McAuliffe [D] | Rep. Lisa Brown [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-12 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2014-02-14 | House | First reading, referred to Capital Budget |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2014-02-12 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-07 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |