WA SB6070 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - Returned to Rules.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - Returned to Rules.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing permissible methods of parking a motorcycle.
Title
Establishing permissible methods of parking a motorcycle.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-01 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | Returned to Rules. |
2018-03-01 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-03-01 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-03-01 | House | Committee amendment |
2018-02-26 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2018-02-23 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-21 | House | TR - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2018-02-21 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2018-02-15 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2018-02-01 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-01-23 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass. |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2018-01-04 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |