WA SB6066 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding ethnic studies materials and resources for public school students in grades kindergarten through six.
Title
Expanding ethnic studies materials and resources for public school students in grades kindergarten through six.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] | Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] | Sen. Derek Stanford [D] |
Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-06 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 64 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | Senate | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Chapter 59, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-06 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 64; nays, 33; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-06 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-05 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-25 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-25 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-25 | House | ED - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-25 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-14 | House | First reading, referred to Education. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 36; nays, 10; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2633 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-16 - First reading, referred to Education.