WA SB6065 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Vetoed on April 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-03 - Governor vetoed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Washington blockchain work group.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing the Washington blockchain work group.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-03SenateGovernor vetoed.
2020-03-12SenateDelivered to Governor.
2020-03-12HouseSpeaker signed.
2020-03-12SenatePresident signed.
2020-03-10SenatePassed final passage; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 1; excused, 1.
2020-03-10SenateSenate concurred in House amendments.
2020-03-05HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2020-03-05HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-03-05HouseCommittee amendment
2020-03-02HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2020-02-28HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2020-02-26HouseITED - Majority; do pass with amendment
2020-02-26HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 8:00 AM.
2020-02-25HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 10:00 AM.
2020-02-20HouseFirst reading, referred to Innovation, Technology & Economic Development.
2020-02-18SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2020-02-18SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-02-18Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2020-02-13SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2020-01-31SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2020-01-30SenateMinority; do not pass.
2020-01-30SenateENET - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2020-01-30SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM.
2020-01-23SenateExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM.
2020-01-14SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM.
2020-01-13SenateFirst reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology.
2019-12-11SenatePrefiled for introduction.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=6065&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6065.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6065-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Passed Legislature/6065-S.PL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=120698&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=02-18-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=6065&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=120698&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-05-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=6065&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=120698&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-10-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=6065&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback