WA SB6065 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing the structure and authority of the liquor control board.
Title
Addressing the structure and authority of the liquor control board.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-02-26 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2010-01-11 | On motion, referred to Rules Green Sheet for second reading. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-04-26 | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2009-04-26 | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-04-22 | Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar. | |
2009-04-21 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 28; nays, 18; absent, 0; excused, 3. | |
2009-04-21 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-04-10 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-02-25 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-25 | GO - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-02-24 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-02-20 | First reading, referred to Government Operations & Elections. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2205 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=6065&year=2009 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2009-10/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6065.pdf |