WA SB6064 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring an analysis of how school districts use school days.
Title
Requiring an analysis of how school districts use school days.
Sponsors
Sen. Stephen Litzow [R] | Sen. Joe Fain [R] | Sen. Bruce Dammeier [R] | Sen. Steven Hobbs [D] |
Sen. Andy Hill [R] | Sen. Randi Becker [R] | Sen. Rodney Tom [D] | Sen. John Braun [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-17 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2014-02-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2014-02-19 | House | First reading, referred to Education |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-17 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-01-24 | Senate | EDU - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |