WA SB6057 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning price differentials in the sale of marijuana.
Title
Concerning price differentials in the sale of marijuana.
Sponsors
Sen. Derek Stanford [D] | Sen. Anna Rivers [R] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] | Sen. Steven Conway [D] |
Sen. Curtis King [R] | Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Returned to Senate Rules 3. |
2020-02-25 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-21 | House | First reading, referred to Commerce & Gaming. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 36; nays, 12; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | LBRC - Majority; do pass. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
2019-12-09 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |