WA SB6053 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing the payment of representation fees in lieu of regular union dues and fees.
Title
Addressing the payment of representation fees in lieu of regular union dues and fees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-02-07 | Senate | CL - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 8:00 AM. |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Commerce & Labor. |