WA SB6053 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Government Operations, Tribal Relations & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Government Operations, Tribal Relations & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Enacting the Washington state English language empowerment act.
Title
Enacting the Washington state English language empowerment act.
Sponsors
Sen. Donald Benton [R] | Sen. Michael Carrell [R] | Sen. Janea Holmquist [R] | Sen. Pamela Roach [R] |
Sen. Val Stevens [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-01-09 | First reading, referred to Government Operations, Tribal Relations & Elections. | |
2012-01-06 | Prefiled for introduction. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=6053&year=2011 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2011-12/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6053.pdf |