WA SB6052 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-03 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning petroleum products supply and pricing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning petroleum products supply and pricing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-03SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM.
2024-01-31SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2024-01-30SenateMinority; do not pass.
2024-01-30SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2024-01-30SenateENET - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2024-01-30SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 1:30 PM.
2024-01-17SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 8:00 AM.
2024-01-09SenateFirst reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology.

Same As/Similar To

HB2232 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-09 - First reading, referred to Environment & Energy.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
19New CodeSee Bill Text
1986140Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4256330Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=6052&Year=2023&Initiative=false
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/Senate%20Bills/6052.pdf
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/Senate%20Bills/6052-S.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/6052%20SBA%20ENET%2024.pdf
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=69266
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/6052%20SBR%20ENET%20TA%2024.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/6052%20SBR%20ENET%20OC%2024.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/6052%20SBA%20WM%2024.pdf
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=70357
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=70378
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/6052%20SBR%20WM%20TA%2024.pdf
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=70495
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=70674
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=130573&actionText=ENET%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=31818&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24

Bill Comments

feedback