WA SB6051 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the medicaid fraud control unit.
Title
Concerning the medicaid fraud control unit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | Senate | Effective date 6/7/2018. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Chapter 238, 2018 Laws. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2018-03-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2018-02-27 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-02-27 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-27 | House | Committee amendment |
2018-02-22 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2018-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-21 | House | JUDI - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2018-02-21 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2018-02-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2018-02-09 | House | First reading, referred to Judiciary |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-07 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | LAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2017-12-22 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2273 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-06 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.