WA SB6041 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-22 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning civil legal aid.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning civil legal aid.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-22SenateSenate Rules "X" file.
2018-02-08SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2018-01-19SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2018-01-18SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2018-01-18SenateLAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2018-01-18SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM.
2018-01-09SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM.
2018-01-08SenateFirst reading, referred to Law & Justice.
2017-12-21SenatePrefiled for introduction.

Same As/Similar To

HB2308 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-09 - Effective date 6/7/2018.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback