WA SB6040 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-03 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the budgeting process for certain state waiver services for individuals with developmental disabilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning the budgeting process for certain state waiver services for individuals with developmental disabilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-03SenateEffective date 6/11/2020.
2020-04-03SenateChapter 352, 2020 Laws.
2020-04-03SenateGovernor signed.
2020-03-12SenateDelivered to Governor.
2020-03-12HouseSpeaker signed.
2020-03-12SenatePresident signed.
2020-03-10SenatePassed final passage; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2020-03-10SenateSenate concurred in House amendments.
2020-03-06HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2020-03-06HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-03-06HouseCommittee amendment
2020-03-04HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2020-03-03HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2020-03-02HouseAPP - Majority; do pass with amendment
2020-03-02HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2020-02-29HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
2020-02-20HouseFirst reading, referred to Appropriations.
2020-02-17SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2020-02-17SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-02-17SenateFloor amendment
2020-02-17Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2020-02-13SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2020-02-07SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2020-02-06SenateWM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2020-02-06SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2020-01-30SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2020-01-13SenateFirst reading, referred to Ways & Means.
2019-12-04SenatePrefiled for introduction.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=6040&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6040.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6040-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6040-S.E.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Passed Legislature/6040-S.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/Senate/6040-S.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=120644&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=02-17-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=6040&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=120644&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-06-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=6040&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=120644&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-10-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=6040&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback