WA SB6039 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Enacting the living donor act.
Title
Enacting the living donor act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | HLTC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
2019-12-04 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |