WA SB6037 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning business corporations.
Title
Concerning business corporations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-27 | Senate | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-03-27 | Senate | Chapter 194, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-27 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-05 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-03 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 56; nays, 40; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-03-03 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-26 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-25 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-21 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-21 | House | CRJ - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-21 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-27 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 32; nays, 14; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-01-24 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-01-16 | Senate | LAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2019-12-03 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |