WA SB6035 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning retrospective rating plans.
Title
Concerning retrospective rating plans.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-26 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2010-01-11 | Made eligible to be placed on third reading. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-04-26 | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2009-04-06 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-04-03 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2009-04-03 | APPH - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-04-03 | APPH - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-04-03 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health & Human Services Appropriations at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-04-01 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health & Human Services Appropriations at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-03-30 | Referred to Health & Human Services Appropriations. | |
2009-03-27 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2009-03-27 | CL - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-03-27 | CL - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-03-27 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Labor at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-03-24 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Labor at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-03-13 | First reading, referred to Commerce & Labor. | |
2009-03-12 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 25; nays, 24; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2009-03-12 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-12 | Floor amendment | |
2009-03-12 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2009-03-12 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-02-25 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-25 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2009-02-25 | LCCP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-02-23 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor and Commerce & Consumer Protection at 6:00 PM. | |
2009-02-19 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor and Commerce & Consumer Protection at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-02-17 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor and Commerce & Consumer Protection at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-02-16 | First reading, referred to Labor, Commerce & Consumer Protection. |