WA SB6033 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-15 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-15 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning ceremonial open carry on the Washington state capitol campus.
Title
Concerning ceremonial open carry on the Washington state capitol campus.
Sponsors
Sen. John Braun [R] | Sen. Perry Dozier [R] | Sen. Chris Gildon [R] | Sen. Jeff Holy [R] |
Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] | Sen. Mark Schoesler [R] | Sen. Keith Wagoner [R] | Sen. Judith Warnick [R] |
Sen. Jeff Wilson [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-01-30 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2024-01-30 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass. |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM. |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM. |
2024-01-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2024-01-05 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |