WA SB6029 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a student loan bill of rights.
Title
Establishing a student loan bill of rights.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-02 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 87 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | Senate | Effective date 6/7/2018. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Chapter 62, 2018 Laws. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2018-03-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-05 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-02 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 87; nays, 11; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-03-02 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-27 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-26 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-02-26 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-26 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 11:00 AM. |
2018-02-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-23 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2018-02-23 | House | HE - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Higher Education at 8:00 AM. |
2018-02-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Higher Education at 1:30 PM. |
2018-02-19 | House | First reading, referred to Higher Education |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 35; nays, 13; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2018-02-14 | Senate | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2018-02-10 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-01-18 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2018-01-18 | Senate | HEWD - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 8:10 AM. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Higher Education & Workforce Development. |
2017-12-15 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |