WA SB6024 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Government Operations, Tribal Relations & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Government Operations, Tribal Relations & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning political subdivisions in the intrastate mutual aid system.
Title
Concerning political subdivisions in the intrastate mutual aid system.
Sponsors
Sen. Maralyn Chase [D] | Sen. Joe Fain [R] | Sen. Curtis King [R] | Sen. Craig Pridemore [D] |
Sen. Pamela Roach [R] | Sen. Paull Shin [D] | Sen. Daniel Swecker [R] | Sen. Rodney Tom [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-01-09 | First reading, referred to Government Operations, Tribal Relations & Elections. | |
2012-12-15 | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2178 (Crossfiled) 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=6024&year=2011 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2011-12/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6024.pdf |