WA SB6018 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on March 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on March 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning security freeze fees charged by consumer reporting agencies.
Title
Concerning security freeze fees charged by consumer reporting agencies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-22 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 81 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-13 | Senate | Effective date 6/7/2018. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Chapter 54, 2018 Laws. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2018-03-03 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-02-22 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 81; nays, 15; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2018-02-22 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-06 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-02 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-01-31 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-01-31 | House | BFS - Majority; do pass. |
2018-01-31 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-30 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-22 | House | First reading, referred to Business & Financial Services |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-01-15 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-01-11 | Senate | FI - Majority; do pass. |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions & Insurance at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions & Insurance at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Financial Institutions & Insurance. |
2017-12-11 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |