WA SB6017 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning consumer protections for military service members on active duty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning consumer protections for military service members on active duty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-08HouseBy resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
2018-02-09HouseFirst reading, referred to Judiciary
2018-02-08SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2018-02-08SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-01-24SenatePlaced on second reading consent calendar.
2018-01-19SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2018-01-18SenateLAW - Majority; do pass.
2018-01-18SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM.
2018-01-09SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM.
2018-01-08SenateFirst reading, referred to Law & Justice.
2017-12-11SenatePrefiled for introduction.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback