WA SB6007 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Extending the expiration date of the public utility tax exemption for certain electrolytic processing businesses.
Title
Extending the expiration date of the public utility tax exemption for certain electrolytic processing businesses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | Senate | Effective date 6/7/2018. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Chapter 146, 2018 Laws. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2018-03-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-07 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2018-03-07 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on second reading. |
2018-03-07 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-03-07 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-03-07 | House | FIN - Majority; do pass. |
2018-03-07 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2018-03-06 | House | First reading, referred to Finance |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | On motion, referred to Ways & Means. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | EENT - Majority; do pass. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Energy, Environment & Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Energy, Environment & Technology at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Energy, Environment & Technology. |
2017-12-07 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |