WA SB6003 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 19 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning breakfast after the bell programs in certain public schools. (REVISED FOR ENGROSSED: Promoting student health and readiness through meal and nutrition programs. )

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning breakfast after the bell programs in certain public schools. (REVISED FOR ENGROSSED: Promoting student health and readiness through meal and nutrition programs. )

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-19 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-08HouseBy resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
2018-01-23HouseFirst reading, referred to Education
2018-01-19SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 40; nays, 8; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2018-01-19SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-01-19SenateFloor amendment
2018-01-17SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2018-01-16SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2018-01-15SenateMinority; do not pass.
2018-01-15SenateEDU - Majority; do pass.
2018-01-15SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM.
2018-01-11SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM.
2018-01-08SenateFirst reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education.
2017-12-06SenatePrefiled for introduction.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback