WA SB6001 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning amendments to bylaws of a condominium association.
Title
Concerning amendments to bylaws of a condominium association.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | LAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2017-12-05 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |