WA SB5996 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Encouraging the disclosure and discussion of sexual harassment and sexual assault in the workplace.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Encouraging the disclosure and discussion of sexual harassment and sexual assault in the workplace.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-27 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-21SenateEffective date 6/7/2018.
2018-03-21SenateChapter 117, 2018 Laws.
2018-03-21SenateGovernor signed.
2018-03-05SenateDelivered to Governor.
2018-03-03HouseSpeaker signed.
2018-03-01SenatePresident signed.
2018-02-27HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2018-02-27HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-02-26HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2018-02-23HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2018-02-22HouseLAWS - Majority; do pass.
2018-02-22HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM.
2018-02-15HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM.
2018-02-09HouseFirst reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards
2018-02-08SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2018-02-08SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-02-08Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2018-02-06SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2018-02-02SenateMade eligible to be placed on second reading.
2018-02-01SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2018-01-31SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2018-01-31SenateLBRC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2018-01-31SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 5:45 PM.
2018-01-24SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 1:30 PM.
2018-01-08SenateFirst reading, referred to Labor & Commerce.
2017-12-04SenatePrefiled for introduction.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback