WA SB5996 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the department of licensing to adopt rules regarding online learning for training in cosmetology, manicuring, barbering, esthetics, and instruction.
Title
Requiring the department of licensing to adopt rules regarding online learning for training in cosmetology, manicuring, barbering, esthetics, and instruction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-05 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2014-03-05 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2014-02-21 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-19 | House | BFS - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-19 | House | BFS - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 1:30 PM. |
2014-02-12 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 9:30 AM. |
2014-02-06 | House | First reading, referred to Business & Financial Services |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-05 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | CL - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Commerce & Labor. |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |