WA SB5993 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Effective date 7/1/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Effective date 7/1/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Reforming the financial structure of the model toxics control program.
Title
Reforming the financial structure of the model toxics control program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-27 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-21 | Senate | Effective date 7/1/2019. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Chapter 422, 2019 Laws. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-28 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-28 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-27 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 50; nays, 48; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-04-27 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-27 | House | Committee amendment not adopted. |
2019-04-27 | House | Placed on second reading. |
2019-04-27 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-04-27 | House | FIN - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-04-27 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 11:30 AM. |
2019-04-26 | House | First reading, referred to Finance. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 27; nays, 22; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2019-04-25 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Placed on second reading. |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |