WA SB5991 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Studying nuclear power as a replacement for electricity generated from the combustion of fossil fuels.
Title
Studying nuclear power as a replacement for electricity generated from the combustion of fossil fuels.
Sponsors
Sen. Douglas Ericksen [R] | Sen. Tim Sheldon [D] | Sen. Michael Hewitt [R] | Rep. Lisa Brown [D] |
Sen. Mark Mullet [D] | Sen. Jim Honeyford [R] | Sen. Donald Benton [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-12 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2014-02-26 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-26 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-02-26 | House | TED - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2014-02-26 | House | TED - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Technology & Economic Development at 3:30 PM. |
2014-02-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Technology & Economic Development at 1:30 PM. |
2014-02-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Technology & Economic Development at 8:00 AM. |
2014-02-13 | House | First reading, referred to Technology & Economic Development |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 34; nays, 15; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-12 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-01-22 | Senate | EET - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Energy and Environment & Telecommunications at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Energy and Environment & Telecommunications at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Energy, Environment & Telecommunications. |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |