WA SB5989 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-15 - Effective date 7/15/2015*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-15 - Effective date 7/15/2015*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing bonds for transportation funding.
Title
Authorizing bonds for transportation funding.
Sponsors
Sen. Curtis King [R] | Sen. Steven Hobbs [D] | Sen. Joe Fain [R] | Sen. Marko Liias [D] |
Sen. Stephen Litzow [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-07-10 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-15 | Senate | Effective date 7/15/2015*. |
2015-07-15 | Senate | Chapter 45, 2015 Laws 3rd Special Session. |
2015-07-15 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2015-07-10 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2015-07-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-07-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-07-10 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 63; nays, 29; absent, 0; excused, 6. |
2015-07-10 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-06-29 | House | Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar. |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 40; nays, 7; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2015-06-29 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2015-06-28 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-06-28 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-02-23 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2015-02-16 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |