WA SB5988 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-15 - Effective date 7/15/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-15 - Effective date 7/15/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning additive transportation funding and appropriations.
Title
Concerning additive transportation funding and appropriations.
Sponsors
Sen. Curtis King [R] | Sen. Steven Hobbs [D] | Sen. Joe Fain [R] | Sen. Marko Liias [D] |
Sen. Stephen Litzow [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-07-10 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-07-01 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-01 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-15 | Senate | Effective date 7/15/2015. |
2015-07-15 | Senate | Chapter 43, 2015 Laws 3rd Special Session PV. |
2015-07-15 | Senate | Governor partially vetoed. |
2015-07-10 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2015-07-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-07-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-07-10 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 61; nays, 30; absent, 0; excused, 7. |
2015-07-10 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-07-07 | House | Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 38; nays, 6; absent, 0; excused, 5. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Returned to second reading for amendment. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2015-06-28 | Senate | Placed on third reading. |
2015-06-28 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-24 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2015-04-17 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-04-14 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-04-14 | House | TR - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2015-04-14 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 6:00 PM. |
2015-03-26 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2015-03-03 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 41; nays, 8; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2015-03-02 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2015-02-23 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2015-02-16 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |