WA SB5987 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning pretrial release programs.
Title
Concerning pretrial release programs.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Padden [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | Senate | Effective date 6/7/2018. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Chapter 276, 2018 Laws. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2018-03-07 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2018-03-07 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-03-07 | House | Floor amendment |
2018-03-07 | House | Returned to second reading for amendment. |
2018-03-07 | House | House receded from amendments. |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Senate refuses to concur in House amendments. Asks House to recede from amendments. |
2018-02-28 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-02-28 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-28 | House | Committee amendment |
2018-02-26 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2018-02-23 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-22 | House | PS - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2018-02-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. |
2018-02-15 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. |
2018-02-09 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2017-12-04 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2679 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-19 - Referred to Rules 2 Consideration.