WA SB5980 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-31 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-31 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing substantial and permanent tax relief for small businesses to mitigate structural deficiencies in Washington's business and occupation tax and lessen long-term negative economic consequences of the pandemic that have disproportionately impacted small businesses. (REVISED FOR ENGROSSED: Providing substantial tax relief for small businesses to mitigate structural deficiencies in Washington's business and occupation tax and lessen long-term negative economic consequences of the pandemic that have disproportionately impacted small businesses.)
Title
Providing substantial and permanent tax relief for small businesses to mitigate structural deficiencies in Washington's business and occupation tax and lessen long-term negative economic consequences of the pandemic that have disproportionately impacted small businesses. (REVISED FOR ENGROSSED: Providing substantial tax relief for small businesses to mitigate structural deficiencies in Washington's business and occupation tax and lessen long-term negative economic consequences of the pandemic that have disproportionately impacted small businesses.)
Sponsors
Sen. Reuven Carlyle [D] | Sen. Emily Randall [D] | Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] |
Sen. Mark Mullet [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House Committee on Finance: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House Committee on Finance: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | Senate | Effective date 6/9/2022. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Chapter 295, 2022 Laws. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2022-03-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2022-03-09 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2022-03-09 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-03-09 | House | Committee amendment |
2022-03-09 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-03-08 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-03-08 | House | FIN - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2022-03-08 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 1:00 PM. |
2022-03-07 | House | Public hearing and executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2022-03-04 | House | First reading, referred to Finance. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2022-03-04 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |