WA SB5979 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Providing salary increases in the form of flat dollar monthly increases calculated using the state average wage determined under RCW 50.04.355.
Title
Providing salary increases in the form of flat dollar monthly increases calculated using the state average wage determined under RCW 50.04.355.
Sponsors
Sen. John Braun [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Moved to Rules White Sheet. |
2016-01-11 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Public hearing, executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2015-02-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |