WA SB5978 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying presidential primary provisions.
Title
Modifying presidential primary provisions.
Sponsors
Sen. Pamela Roach [R] | Sen. Marko Liias [D] | Sen. Joe Fain [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-29 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2016-01-11 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-28 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2015-05-01 | House | First reading, referred to State Government |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 31; nays, 13; absent, 0; excused, 5. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-04-24 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2015-04-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 8:30 AM. |
2015-04-17 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2015-04-17 | House | Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2015-03-12 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government at 1:30 PM. |
2015-03-05 | House | First reading, referred to State Government |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 36; nays, 12; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | On motion, referred to Rules. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | GOS - Majority; do pass. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Security at 10:00 AM. |
2015-02-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Government Operations & Security. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2139 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.