WA SB5976 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing the notice given to owners of life insurance policies about alternative transactions.
Title
Addressing the notice given to owners of life insurance policies about alternative transactions.
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Fain [R] | Sen. Steven Hobbs [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-01-24 | Senate | FIHI - Majority; do pass. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions and Housing & Insurance at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions and Housing & Insurance at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Financial Institutions, Housing & Insurance. |
2014-12-24 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2134 (Crossfiled) 2014-01-23 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5976&year=2013 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2013-14/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5976.pdf |