WA SB5974 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-25 - Effective date 7/1/2022*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-25 - Effective date 7/1/2022*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing transportation resources.
Title
Addressing transportation resources.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Recommended by Conference Committee (Y: 29 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - House Final Passage as recommended by the Conference Committee (Y: 54 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 54 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate Committee on Transportation: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - House Final Passage as recommended by the Conference Committee (Y: 54 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 54 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate Committee on Transportation: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-25 | Senate | Effective date 7/1/2022*. |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Chapter 182, 2022 Laws. |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2022-03-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Passed final passage as recommended by conference committee; yeas, 29; nays, 20; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted. |
2022-03-10 | House | Passed final passage as recommended by conference committee; yeas, 54; nays, 44; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-03-10 | House | Conference committee report adopted. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Signed by Senators Liias, Saldaa; Representatives Fey, Wylie. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Conference committee report; received 2:30 PM 3/9/2022. |
2022-03-09 | House | Signed by Representatives Fey, Wylie; Senators Liias, Saldaa. |
2022-03-09 | House | Conference committee report; received 1:40 PM 3/9/2022. |
2022-03-07 | House | Conference committee appointed. Representatives Barkis, Fey, Wylie. |
2022-03-07 | House | Conference committee request granted. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Conference committee appointed. Senators Liias, Saldaa, King. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate refuses to concur in House amendments. Asks House for conference thereon. |
2022-03-01 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 54; nays, 43; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2022-03-01 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-03-01 | House | Floor amendment |
2022-02-28 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-02-25 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-02-25 | House | Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2022-02-17 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 29; nays, 20; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2022-02-15 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-02-14 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 8:00 AM. |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 8:00 AM. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 8:00 AM. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2119 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-24 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 21 | 870 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 73 | 065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
43 | 330 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 84 | 092 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
46 | 17 | 015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
46 | 17 | 025 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
46 | 17 | 120 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
46 | 17 | 200 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
46 | 17 | 400 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
46 | 20 | 200 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
46 | 20 | 202 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
46 | 52 | 130 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
46 | 63 | 170 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
46 | 68 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
46 | 68 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
46 | 70 | 180 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 04 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
47 | 24 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
47 | 56 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
47 | 60 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
47 | 66 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
70a | 535 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
70a | 535 | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70a | 535 | 020 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
70a | 535 | 030 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70a | 535 | 040 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70a | 535 | 050 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70a | 535 | 120 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70a | 65 | 030 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70a | 65 | 040 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70a | 65 | 230 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70a | 65 | 240 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 04 | 4496 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 08 | 816 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 08 | 993 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 08 | 9999 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 12 | 816 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 12 | 817 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 12 | 9999 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 14 | 0455 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 16 | 0496 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 21 | 030 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 32 | 385 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 38 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
82 | 38 | 020 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 38 | 030 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 38 | 035 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 38 | 180 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 42 | 020 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 47 | 020 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 70 | 040 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 70 | 050 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |