WA SB5968 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - On motion, referred to Energy, Environment & Technology.
Pending: Senate Energy, Environment & Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - On motion, referred to Energy, Environment & Technology.
Pending: Senate Energy, Environment & Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Regarding the funding of oil spill prevention and oil spill response.
Title
Regarding the funding of oil spill prevention and oil spill response.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | On motion, referred to Energy, Environment & Technology. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-06-29 | Senate | EET - Majority; do pass. |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Energy, Environment & Telecommunications at 8:00 AM. |
2017-06-28 | Senate | On motion, referred to Energy, Environment & Telecommunications. |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Held at the Desk. |
2017-06-27 | Senate | First Reading. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5968&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5968.pdf |