WA SB5964 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning consolidated local permit review processes.
Title
Concerning consolidated local permit review processes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-23 - House - House Committee on Local Government: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government: do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government: do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2022-02-24 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2022-02-23 | House | LG - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2022-02-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2022-02-22 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2022-02-17 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2022-02-05 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | HLG - Majority; do pass. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government at 10:30 AM. |
2022-01-31 | Senate | First reading, referred to Housing & Local Government. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36 | 70b | New Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 70b | 140 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |