WA SB5962 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reducing the business and occupation tax rate on the business of printing, and of publishing newspapers, magazines, or periodicals.
Title
Reducing the business and occupation tax rate on the business of printing, and of publishing newspapers, magazines, or periodicals.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-02-18 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-02-10 | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2123 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5962&year=2009 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2009-10/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5962.pdf |