WA SB5961 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reducing the business and occupation tax burden on the newspaper industry.
Title
Reducing the business and occupation tax burden on the newspaper industry.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-02-10 | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2122 (Crossfiled) 2009-05-12 - Effective date 7/1/2009***.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5961&year=2009 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2009-10/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5961.pdf |