WA SB5959 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-09 - First reading, referred to Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources.
Pending: House Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources Committee
Hearing: Mar 22 @ 10:00 am in House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Res
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Revising livestock identification law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revising livestock identification law.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-09HouseFirst reading, referred to Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources.
2019-03-07SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 43; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 4.
2019-03-07SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-07SenateFloor amendment
2019-03-07Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2019-03-07SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-03-01SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-02-26SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2019-02-26SenateWM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-26SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-25SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-19SenateFirst reading, referred to Ways & Means.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback