WA SB5956 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Regarding voluntary participation in a state or national animal identification system.
Title
Regarding voluntary participation in a state or national animal identification system.
Sponsors
Sen. Donald Benton [R] | Sen. Christopher Marr [D] | Sen. Mark Schoesler [R] | Sen. Paull Shin [D] |
Sen. Val Stevens [R] | Sen. Joseph Zarelli [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-02-17 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture & Rural Economic Development at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-02-10 | First reading, referred to Agriculture & Rural Economic Development. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2086 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5956&year=2009 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2009-10/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5956.pdf |