WA SB5947 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-30 - Effective date 6/30/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-30 - Effective date 6/30/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the Columbia river salmon and steelhead endorsement program.
Title
Concerning the Columbia river salmon and steelhead endorsement program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-30 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 87 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-30 | Senate | Effective date 6/30/2017. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Chapter 3, 2017 Laws 3rd Special Session. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2017-06-30 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-06-30 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 87; nays, 6; absent, 0; excused, 5. |
2017-06-30 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-06-30 | House | Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2017-06-30 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 8:00 AM. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | NRP - Majority; do pass. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources & Parks at 9:00 AM. |
2017-06-09 | Senate | First reading, referred to Natural Resources & Parks. |