WA SB5946 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the application of the state environmental policy act to temporary shelters and transitional encampments.
Title
Concerning the application of the state environmental policy act to temporary shelters and transitional encampments.
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] | Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] | Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] | Sen. Mona Das [D] |
Sen. Liz Lovelett [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Returned to Senate Rules 3. |
2020-02-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-27 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-27 | House | ENVI - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-02-27 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-25 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-27 | House | First reading, referred to Environment & Energy. |
2020-01-24 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 40; nays, 7; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-01-13 | House | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-28 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2019-04-26 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2019-04-15 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-04-03 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-04-01 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-04-01 | House | ENVI - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-04-01 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-07 | House | First reading, referred to Environment & Energy. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 35; nays, 12; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2019-03-05 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | HSA - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Housing Stability & Affordability. |