WA SB5944 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning negligent entrustment by rental car agencies.
Title
Concerning negligent entrustment by rental car agencies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2018-02-13 | House | First reading, referred to Judiciary |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | LAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |