WA SB5936 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-03 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-03 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing short-term disaster recovery financial assistance to agricultural producers.
Title
Providing short-term disaster recovery financial assistance to agricultural producers.
Sponsors
Sen. Simon Sefzik [R] | Sen. Liz Lovelett [D] | Sen. Perry Dozier [R] | Sen. Jeff Holy [R] |
Sen. Mark Schoesler [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks: do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | AWNP - Majority; do pass. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2051 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-31 - Effective date 3/31/2022.